LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB115
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB115
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB115
Action History
01/31/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/04/2012
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
05/02/2011
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 809.) Reconsideration granted.
04/12/2011
Set for hearing May 2.
02/10/2011
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
01/20/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
01/19/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.