06/18/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |||
06/11/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/07/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 3429.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3388.) (April 30). | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 30. | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3123.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/02/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |