|
09/29/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4982.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6461.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6263.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). (Received by the desk pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 3745.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected May 30.)
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3591.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3314.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3206.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|