|
09/29/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4972.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6464.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Page 6249.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the Assembly amendments were concurred in. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4467.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5846.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3614.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3205.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|