|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5081.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6671.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6672.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6555.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6150.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4222.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2012
|
Set for hearing June 25.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing June 12.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Corrected May 29.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3515.) (May 14).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|