07/13/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/13/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/03/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |||
06/27/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/27/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5482.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |||
05/25/2012 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3470.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |||
04/24/2012 | Set for hearing May 1. | |||
03/29/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/26/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |