05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3303.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
03/28/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/27/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |