LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1168
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1168
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1168
Action History
03/28/2012
Set for hearing May 9.
03/27/2012
Hearing postponed by committee.
03/22/2012
Set for hearing April 25.
03/01/2012
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
02/23/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
02/22/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.