|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 231, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1999.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2331.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 896.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 559.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 415.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|