|
07/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4318.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5563.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3470.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|