California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill June 27, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 12, 2012