|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4677.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6012.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5844.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and INS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3291.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3209.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3122.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|