|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 2). Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3646.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3592.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|