06/11/2012 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hancock. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3311.) (April 24). | |||
04/17/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |