|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3467.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3259.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|