08/28/2012 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
06/18/2012 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/15/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/14/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
04/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3332.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/25/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3188.) (April 17). | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |