|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5482.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3292.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3232.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|