05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
04/30/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 30. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3210.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/30/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/29/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/26/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |