|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 20. Page 6031.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3640.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3389.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|