California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill June 28, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 26, 2012