|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1112.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 738.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|