California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2012

Amended

Bill May 29, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012