05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/14/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 24). | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/04/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |