05/02/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/01/2012 | Set for hearing May 9. | |||
04/18/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |