LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1206
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1206
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1206
Compare Versions
SB1206 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1206 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1206 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1206 Amended July 2, 2012
SB1206 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1206 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1206 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1206 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1206 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1206 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1206 Amended July 2, 2012
SB1206 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1206 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1206 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare