|
09/01/2012
|
Motion to reconsider lapsed.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Motion to reconsider continued.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 32. Noes 36. Page 6073.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 3705.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 18. Page 3660.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3660.)
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3309.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|