|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3750.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|