|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4768.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6130.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3745.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3209.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|