|
08/28/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6204.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|