06/19/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3666.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/23/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/22/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/21/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/11/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/02/2012 | Set for hearing May 8. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/23/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |||
02/22/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |