LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1214
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1214
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1214
Action History
04/16/2012
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 5. Page 3189.) Reconsideration granted.
03/28/2012
Set for hearing April 16.
03/01/2012
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
02/23/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
02/22/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.