California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill May 7, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012