05/31/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3749.) | |||
05/25/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3593.) (May 24). | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3304.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3314.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
04/18/2012 | Set for hearing April 25 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 24. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |