|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5080.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 6441.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6250.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3531.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|