01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/02/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 621.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/05/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
04/04/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2011 | Set for hearing March 22. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
01/26/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. | |||
01/25/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |