LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1231
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1231
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1231
Action History
05/07/2012
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3447.) Reconsideration granted.
05/01/2012
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
04/25/2012
Set for hearing May 7.
03/08/2012
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
02/24/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
02/23/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.