|
09/26/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5063.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6350.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6088.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3716.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3593.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3120.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|