|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 655, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5098.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Set for hearing August 30. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 5042.)
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4923.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6459.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6254.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3750.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3594.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3260.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|