LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB124
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB124
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB124
Compare Versions
SB124 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB124 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB124 Amended August 20, 2012
SB124 Amended August 6, 2012
SB124 Amended April 25, 2011
SB124 Introduced January 26, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB124 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB124 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB124 Amended August 20, 2012
SB124 Amended August 6, 2012
SB124 Amended April 25, 2011
SB124 Introduced January 26, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare