California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2012

Amended

Bill May 29, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012