LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1249
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1249
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1249
Compare Versions
SB1249 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB1249 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1249 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1249 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1249 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1249 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1249 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1249 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1249 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1249 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1249 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB1249 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1249 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1249 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1249 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1249 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1249 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1249 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1249 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1249 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare