01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/26/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/31/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/23/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/04/2011 | Set for hearing March 29. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
01/27/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | |||
01/26/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |