05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/21/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/14/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3459.) (May 8). | |||
04/26/2012 | Set for hearing May 8. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |