08/16/2012 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/08/2012 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/14/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/06/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 3398.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3188.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |