|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4978.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 6332.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6168.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 3639.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3459.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3122.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|