|
08/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4467.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5845.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3431.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3390.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|