|
09/29/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4980.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6444.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6251.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected July 3.)
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3711.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3594.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3124.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|