05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/21/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/11/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/08/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3308.) (April 24). | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |