|
08/15/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 929.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 643.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|