04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/29/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
03/19/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing March 28. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |